This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:10:33 (UTC).

WESTERN GENERAL VS VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 WESTERN GENERAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VASQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7692

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTERN GENERAL

WESTERN RENTALS

Defendants

VASQUEZ MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING INC.

VASQUEZ MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING INC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WESTERN RENTALS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WESTERN RENTALS FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:49; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; WESTERN RENTALS REPRESENTED BY JEREMY MERTZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC, VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC, VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC. HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; PLAINTIFFS NAME AMENDED IN COURT FROM WESTERN GENERAL TO WESTERN RENTALS; JEREMY MERTZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC, VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC..; JUDGMENT FOR: WESTERN RENTALS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC, VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $139.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,639.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC. PARTY SERVED ON 10/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC.; PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC.; PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC; PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC; PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY WESTERN RENTALS

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY WESTERN RENTALS

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0632 $50.00; 171005-0632-EZ Reference Number 2WL37220NV111015

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WESTERN RENTALS FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF SATISFACTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180807-0588 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WESTERN RENTALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; COURT ATTENDANT CUAUHTEMOC NUNEZ; APPEARANCES:; WESTERN RENTALS REPRESENTED BY WENDY BARBA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR.; BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED UPON RECEIPT OF SIGNED AFFIDAVIT AND PROCESSING FEE MADE PAYABLE TO THE APPROPRIATE SERVING AGENCY.; BENCH WARRANT IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,664.00 MAY FORFEIT.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 10:31; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • ORAP RETURNED SERVED AS TO VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( GIVEN TO CUSTOMER OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180521-0674 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0359 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0343 $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; COURT ATTENDANT CUAUHTEMOC NUNEZ; APPEARANCES:; WESTERN RENTALS REPRESENTED BY WENDY BARBA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO SERVICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180327-0958 $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • POS-SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY WESTERN RENTALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PARTY VASQUEZ MAINTENANCEENGINEERINGINC. UPDATED: AGENT FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • ** VOID ** SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY MAIL SB75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0677 $15.00; 171005-0677-EZ Reference Number 2WL37220NV111015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0674 $15.00; 171005-0674-VS Reference Number 2WL37220NV111015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0673 $15.00; 171005-0673-EZ Reference Number 2WL37220NV111015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171005-0632 $50.00; 171005-0632-EZ Reference Number 2WL37220NV111015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less