This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/01/2021 at 16:35:21 (UTC).

WESTERN GENERAL INS -V- LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 WESTERN GENERAL INS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1756

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

JESSENIA M MACIEL

MARY LORRAINE LOPEZ

LOPEZ, MARY LORRAINE

MACIEL, JESSENIA M

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVUN, ROY A

1742 Flowerdale St

Simi Valley, CA 93063

Collection at Law Inc

Attorney at Collection at Law Inc

 

Court Documents

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMP

06/01/2020: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMP

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION

06/01/2020: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION

DECLARATION RE- REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER C

06/01/2020: DECLARATION RE- REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER C

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

06/01/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ROY L

05/27/2020: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ROY L

NOTICE IMAGED

04/06/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JESSENIA M MACIEL

12/30/2019: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JESSENIA M MACIEL

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARY LORRAINE LOP

12/30/2019: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MARY LORRAINE LOP

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

12/30/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

12/30/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

11/01/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT. MISSING CERTIFIC

10/24/2019: NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT. MISSING CERTIFIC

NOTICE IMAGED

10/24/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10/24/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

10/24/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

10/24/2019: COMPLAINT FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/27/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (10/24/2019 - 0001 - COMComplaint (Limited Jurisdiction)); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION; Awarded Against; MACIEL, JESSENIA M; LOPEZ, MARY LORRAINE; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,306.81; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $523.00; Other: $6,741.28; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $9571.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSigned Judgment Filed With Court; Comment: SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/20 JUDGMENT FOR: WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARY LORRAINE LOPEZ, JESSENIA M MACIEL JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,741.28 INTEREST $2,306.81 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $523.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9571.09 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Does Only; Comment: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed; Comment: DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReq to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed; Comment: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON MARY LORRAINE LOPEZ, JESSENIA M MACIEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ROY LEVUN WITH COLLECTION AT LAW INC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $240.00; Total Payments and Credits: $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF MISSING DOCUMENTS SENT. MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT LOCAL FORM 13-16503-360. SUBMIT COA AS SOON AS POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR NEW FILING FEE 191024-0762-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 191024-0762-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1157

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVUN ROY ALAN