This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:35:31 (UTC).

WEST AMERICAN -V- GOLDEN EXPRESS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 WEST AMERICAN -V- GOLDEN EXPRESS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9525

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GOLDEN EXPRESS TRUCKING INC

MANINDER SINGH GREWAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF YEMPUKU, WETTERS & MCNAMARA

2180 Harvard St Suite 375

Sacramento, CA 95815

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR THIS CASE AS SOON AS POSSIBLE. THANK YOU

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/SANCTIONS/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOA A FINAL ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PREVIOUS SANCTIONS IN THE; AMOUNT OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC; 3.110(B). ALSO WHY ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO; APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B).; COURT STATES THAT ANOTHER FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN MATTER BEING DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 06/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:46; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO; $50.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED IS; $140.00; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/SANCTIONS/TSC SET FOR 05/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:59; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0863 $380.00; 171004-0863-CK Reference Number 159410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WEST AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR THIS CASE AS SOON AS POSSIBLE. THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less