This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:17:44 (UTC).

WESCO-V-GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 WESCO-V-GONZALEZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2081

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JAIME GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AINES, LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. H

30495 Canwood Street Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171122-0950 $25.00; 171122-0950-CK Reference Number 50898

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 10/26/17; JUDGMENT FOR: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAIME GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,000.00 INTEREST $190.25 ATTORNEY FEES $550.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,740.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION OF TODD F HAINES RE:PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTY FEES FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JAIME GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:14; THE COURT IS ADVISED PLAINTIFF HAS NOT RECEIVED THE EXECUTED 585 DECLARATION.; COURT FURTHER ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT; OF $100.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT PACKET PURSUANT TO CRC 3.110(H).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR 11/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 09:14; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO JAIME GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JAIME GONZALEZ SERVED ON 03/19/17 WITH FEES OF $56.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0492 $240.00; 170206-0492-CK Reference Number CK 47264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.