Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 15:23:45 (UTC).

WENDY CASTILLO -V- JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 WENDY CASTILLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3352

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Other

WENDY CASTILLO

Respondents and Others

JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO

WENDY CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Other Attorneys

LEVINSON, MARK L

10573 West Pico Blvd #239

Los Angeles, CA 90064

IRWIN, ALAN DAVID

4959 Palo Verde Street #208C-8

Montclair, CA 91763

WOOLDRIDGE, KYLE E

14369 Park Ave Suite 100C

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: EVIDENTIARY RE CONTEMPT (RSPDT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO RE: OTHER: MOTION TO RECONSIDER (020518)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO 08/07/18 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • HEARING RE: PRETRIAL (RESPONDENT); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN IRWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF WENDY CASTILLO PRESENT; ATTORNEY KYLE WOOLDRIDGE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY ALAN IRWIN .; WITNESS -- WENDY CASTILLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY KYLE WOOLDRIDGE .; MATTER IS CONTESTED; COURT TRIAL REQUESTED.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12; HEARING RE: EVIDENTIARY RE CONTEMPT (RSPDT) SET FOR 10/23/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12.; TIME WAIVED UNTIL 10/23/18.; (PLUS 45 DAYS); RESPONDENT IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO RE: OTHER: MOTION TO RECONSIDER (020518); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN IRWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF WENDY CASTILLO PRESENT; ATTORNEY MARK LEVINSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PARTIES BY STIPULATION TO JOIN WITH OTHER RFOS.; SET ON 10/23/18.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/23/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT V12.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY WENDY CASTILLO RE: CC/CV/CS/SS/PROP CNTRL OTH:STOP RESP FROM TRANSFER RING PROP TEMP ORDERS (121517); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN IRWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF WENDY CASTILLO PRESENT; ATTORNEY MARK LEVINSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; SEE MINUTE ORDER OF SAME DATE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO RE: CHANGE DV,PROP CNTRL,OTH:EBD DV ORDRS,RETURN PERSO NAL PROP, TEMP ORDERS (072018); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN IRWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF WENDY CASTILLO PRESENT; ATTORNEY MARK LEVINSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY ALAN IRWIN .; WITNESS -- WENDY CASTILLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY MARK LEVINSON .; WITNESS -- JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; COURT GRANTS RESPONDENTS REQUEST TO BE ALLOWED TO RETRIEVE HIS PERSONAL PROPERTY FROM; PETITIONERS CURRENT ADDRESS PURSUANT TO THE FOLLOWING GUIDELINES:; PARTIES SHALL MEET AND CONFER TO CREATE A LIST OF PERSONAL PROPERTY THE RESPONDENT IS REQUESTING TO; REMOVE FROM THE RESIDENCE AND TO AGREE ON DATE AND TIME WHEN RESPONDENT WILL REMOVE THE; PROPERTY. RESPONDENT WILL BE ALLOWED A MAXIMUM OF 2 OTHER PEOPLE TO ASSIST WITH REMOVING THE; PROPERTY.; PEACEFUL CONTACT DURING REMOVAL OF THE PERSONAL PROPERTY FROM THE RESIDENCE WILL NOT BE DEEMED A; VIOLATION OF THE RESTRAINING ORDER.; COURT DENIES REQUEST TO MODIFY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ORDER FOR CUSTODY/VISITATION EXCHANGES.; ALL EXISTING ORDERS SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT.; COURT ORDERS RESPONDENT NOTIFY THE SALES AGENT FOR THE RESIDENCE IS ALLOWED TO MAKE CONTACT AND; GATHER INFORMATION AS IT RELATES TO THE SALE AND CLOSE OF ESCROW FOR THE PROPERTY. PETITIONER; SHALL PARTICIPATE AND COOPERATE IN THE LISTING AND SALE OF THE PROPERTY.; WRITTEN STIPULATION ON SPECIFIC ISSUES AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER BY REFERENCE AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN,AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED; TO EXECUTE ALL THE PROVISIONS OF THAT ORDER.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COPIES GIVEN TO PARTIES/COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; GUY BOVEE, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: REBECCA J. NAJAR; COURT REPORTER RITA CORTINAS 7776; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALAN IRWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PLAINTIFF WENDY CASTILLO PRESENT; ATTORNEY MARK LEVINSON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; RESPONDENT JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY ALAN IRWIN .; WITNESS -- WENDY CASTILLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY ATY MARK LEVINSON .; WITNESS -- JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; COURT DENIES RESPONDENTS REQUEST TO BIFURCATE STATUS AS PETITIONER HAS NOT SERVED DECLARATION; OF DISCLOSURE AND FILED FL141, AS REQUIRED.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PARTIES NOT READY TO PROCEED WITH DISSOLUTION; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY WENDY CASTILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF WENDY CASTILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY WENDY CASTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY WENDY CASTILLO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON WENDY CASTILLO FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINSON MARK LYNN