This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:11:49 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO-V-TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 WELLS FARGO-V-TORRES was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9069

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

PATRICIA A TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PATRICIA A TORRES SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PATRICIA A TORRES SERVED ON 10/16/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PATRICIA A TORRES.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PATRICIA A TORRES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: ATTY FEES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: ATTY FEES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMETN FILED

DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMETN FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICIA A TORRES FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICIA A TORRES FILED.

DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180430-0985 $25.00; 180430-0985-CK Reference Number 4408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/27/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/13/18; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PATRICIA A TORRES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,823.86 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $925.00 COSTS $449.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $14,198.36; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS UNDER EC SECTION 1553 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMETN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PATRICIA A TORRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE SUMMARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTY FEES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0231 $380.00; 170928-0231-CK Reference Number 22609

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,823.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less