This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:16:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO-V-ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 WELLS FARGO-V-ORTIZ was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9098

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONALBANK

Defendant

FABIOLA I ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0058381487

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONALBANK FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180314-0309 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONALBANK FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180305-0140 $5.00; 180305-0140-MC Reference Number 033-0056955096

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • SERVICE COMPLETION WITH DECLARATION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLA IS REQUESTING ADDITONAL TIME FOR SERVICE MUST SUBMIT ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO FABIOLA I ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/DSDS1719098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONALBANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONALBANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0620 $240.00; 170928-0620-CK Reference Number 0759346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,726.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less