This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:25:52 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO-V-LINO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 WELLS FARGO-V-LINO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7865

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

FRANK A LINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW,INC

3835 East Thousand Oaks Blvd Suite #R-349

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • CLERKS JUDGMENT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SERVICE FEES ARE EXCESSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TO FRANK A LINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST FRANK A LINO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FOR SANCTIONS; Minutes; Receipt: 180404-0518 $140.00; 180404-0518-CK Reference Number 60126

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FRANK A LINO SERVED ON 02/17/18 WITH FEES OF $68.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL,; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $140.00 PAYABLE TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/12/18.; SANCTIONS ARE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT.; THE COURT ORDERS MATTER BE SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/ TRIAL SETTING; CONFERENCE. IF AN ANSWER IS FILED, PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE AS APPROPRIATE.; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 03/15/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:42; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0912 $240.00; 170914-0912-CK Reference Number 47532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less