This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:47:34 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO -V- HOOVER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOOVER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1937

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

MONIQUE C HOOVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONIQUE C HOOVER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0122 $240.00; 170203-0122-CK Reference Number CK#23588

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.