This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:12:20 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO -V- GUEVARA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 WELLS FARGO -V- GUEVARA was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9434

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

SERGIO GUEVARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HEMAR, ROUSSO &HEALD, LLP

15910 Ventura Blvd 12Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE MOTION ON PETITION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE MOTION ON PETITION FILED.

DECLARATION OF IRWIN M. WITTLIN RE: TELEPHONIC NTC OF XPARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF IRWIN M. WITTLIN RE: TELEPHONIC NTC OF XPARTE FILED

ORDER TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

ORDER TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO PERMIT INSPECTION OR SHORTEN TO BE HEARD ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO PERMIT INSPECTION OR SHORTEN TO BE HEARD ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO PERMIT INSPECTION OR SHORTEN TO BE HEARD ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO PERMIT INSPECTION OR SHORTEN TO BE HEARD ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SERGIO GUEVARA SERVED ON 01/05/18 WITH FEES OF $182.77.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SERGIO GUEVARA SERVED ON 01/05/18 WITH FEES OF $182.77.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SERGIO GUEVARA SERVED ON 01/05/18 WITH FEES OF $182.77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • MOTION RE: PLAINTIFF FOR APP FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY IRWIN M. WITTLIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO INSPECT PROPERTY IS HEARD.; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED MOTION AND MOTION RELATED DOCUMENTS.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO ALLOW INSPECTION OF PROPERTY IS GRANTED.; ANY DAMAGES AS A RESULT OF THE INSPECTION WILL BE THE RESPONSIBILITY OF WELLS FARGO.; COURT ORDERS THAT PLAINTIFF PROVIDE AT LEAST TWENTY-FOUR(24) HOURS NOTICE OF INSPECTION.; MOVING PARTY TO PREPARE NOTICE OF RULING.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE MOTION ON PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • EX-PARTE PAPERS TRACKED BACK TO CIVIL CLERKS OFFICE FOR FILE BACK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER OR SHORTEN TIME FOR NTC MTN; MEP; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY IRWIN WITTEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO FILE PROVIDED.; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; COURT FINDS:; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER CONTINUED TO GIVE DEFENDANT AN OPPORTUNITY TO FILE AN OPPOSITION.; COURT DEEMS EX-PARTE PAPERS THE MOVING PAPERS. PLAINTIFF MUST SERVE THE DEFENDANT WITH THESE; MOTION DOCUMENTS BY THE END OF CLOSING BUSINESS ON 10/31/17. COURT ORDERS ANY OPPOSITION TO BE; FILED BY 11/06/17 AND ANY REPLY TO BE FILED BY 11/08/17.; HEARINGS:; LAW & MOTION RE: PLAINTIFF FOR APP FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME SET FOR 11/09/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S28.; PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF IRWIN M. WITTLIN RE: TELEPHONIC NTC OF XPARTE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: PLA APP FOR ORDER TO PERMIT INSPECTION OR SHORTEN TO BE HEARD ON 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR EX PARTE; Minutes; Receipt: 171027-0189 $90.00; 171027-0189-CK Reference Number #94925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0289 $435.00; 171004-0289-CK Reference Number CK 29318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less