This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:25:45 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO-V-CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 WELLS FARGO-V-CASTILLO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7864

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

RUBEN CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW,INC

3835 East Thousand Oaks Blvd Suite #R-349

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/01/17 AS TO RUBEN CASTILLO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK NA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0919 $240.00; 170914-0919-CK Reference Number 47497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less