This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:10:05 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO -V- BRYANT A REYNAGA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRYANT A REYNAGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1739

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

Defendant

BRYANT A REYNAGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: ALEXA A CHRISOS REGARDING FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

DECLARATION RE: ALEXA A CHRISOS REGARDING FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA ORDERED ENTERED 08/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRYANT A REYNAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,669.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,988.57; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRYANT A REYNAGA.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON BRYANT A REYNAGA.

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; QUALL CARDOT LLP FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, NA NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:37; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL ($75-FTA & $50-FTC 3.740(E)) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $125.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 07/13/17.; COUNSEL TO FILE A DECLARATION WITH THE COURT AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING, REGARDING; WHY SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN COMPLETED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/ PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BRYANT A REYNAGA SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BRYANT A REYNAGA SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED.

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

DECLARATION RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AS TO DOES ONLY

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/ PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA ORDERED ENTERED 08/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, NA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRYANT A REYNAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,669.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $319.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,988.57; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, NA AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; QUALL CARDOT LLP FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, NA NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:37; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL ($75-FTA & $50-FTC 3.740(E)) IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $125.00 PAYABLE TO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 07/13/17.; COUNSEL TO FILE A DECLARATION WITH THE COURT AT LEAST 10 DAYS PRIOR TO NEXT HEARING, REGARDING; WHY SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN COMPLETED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/ PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS SET FOR 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:38; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PARTY BRYANT A REYNAGA UPDATED: ADDED DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NA FOR FIRST PAPER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161223-0007 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.