This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 12:01:00 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO -V- ANGERER

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 WELLS FARGO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGERER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0920

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

LINDA V ANGERER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REEASE LAW GROUP

3168 Lionshead Avenue

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/20/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/20/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/20/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/31/18; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA V ANGERER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,781.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $925.00 COSTS $449.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $14,155.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED

ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED

ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION CCP 585 (A) FILED.

ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION CCP 585 (A) FILED.

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

CASE SUMMARY FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LINDA V ANGERER.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LINDA V ANGERER.

DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPP OF JUDGMNT (CCP585) FILED

DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPP OF JUDGMNT (CCP585) FILED

DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LINDA V ANGERER FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LINDA V ANGERER FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LINDA V ANGERER SERVED ON 11/16/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LINDA V ANGERER SERVED ON 11/16/17 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180326-0412 $25.00; 180326-0412-CK Reference Number 4065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/20/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 10/20/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 01/31/18; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LINDA V ANGERER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,781.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $925.00 COSTS $449.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $14,155.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ACCEPTING IMAGED DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION CCP 585 (A) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE SUMMARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON LINDA V ANGERER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KAITLYN M SMITH IN SUPP OF JUDGMNT (CCP585) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,781.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0792 $380.00; 171025-0792-CK Reference Number 22614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.