This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 01:38:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK -V- SICAN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SICAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7386

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

JOSUE V SICAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW,INC

3835 East Thousand Oaks Blvd Suite #R-349

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/07/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/07/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/07/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/14/18; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSUE V SICAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $11,548.44 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $650.00 COSTS $460.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,658.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEES CCP 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEES CCP 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSUE V SICAN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSUE V SICAN.

DECLARATION OF JARROD M EMAMIAN IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF JARROD M EMAMIAN IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSUE V SICAN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSUE V SICAN FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSUE V SICAN SERVED ON 09/24/17 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSUE V SICAN SERVED ON 09/24/17 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE CANNOT BE DISMISSED THERE HAS BEEN A JUDGMENT FILED 2/14/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LACK OF ORIGINAL CONTRACT AND INVOICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/07/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 09/07/2017 OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 02/14/18; JUDGMENT FOR: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSUE V SICAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $11,548.44 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $650.00 COSTS $460.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12,658.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEES CCP 1033 FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSUE V SICAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JARROD M EMAMIAN IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSUE V SICAN SERVED ON 09/24/17 WITH FEES OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR OVERAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0810 $5.00; 170907-0810-CK Reference Number CK 46756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0807 $380.00; 170907-0807-CK Reference Number CK 46756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.