This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:18:25 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK -V- GAEDE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAEDE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2086

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

EDNA M GAEDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLECTION AT LAW,INC

3835 East Thousand Oaks Blvd Suite R-349

Westlake Village, CA 91362

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0586 $380.00; 170206-0586-CK Reference Number 39834

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0586 $380.00; 170206-0586-CK Reference Number 39834

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT FILED.; Minutes; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND SETTLEMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DEFENDANT EDNA M GAEDE FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR STIP/ORDER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0867 $20.00; 170711-0867-CK Reference Number CK 44088

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDNA M GAEDE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0865 $380.00; 170711-0865-CK Reference Number CK 44088

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDNA M GAEDE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0586 $380.00; 170206-0586-CK Reference Number 39834

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.