This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:12:31 (UTC).

WARDEN & SONS -V- GILMORE REFRIGERATION

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 WARDEN SONS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GILMORE REFRIGERATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9436

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUY L. WARDEN & SONS

Defendant

GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Avenue Ste. 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/23/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G. PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/23/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G. PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: GUY L. WARDEN & SONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $55,491.90 INTEREST $5,715.20 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $517.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $61,724.10; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF JOHN D GUERRINI IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF JOHN D GUERRINI IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS AS TO DOES ONLY

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/06/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/06/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH FEES OF $82.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH FEES OF $82.00.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/23/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G. PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS ORDERED ENTERED 02/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: GUY L. WARDEN & SONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $55,491.90 INTEREST $5,715.20 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $517.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $61,724.10; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN D GUERRINI IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/06/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF G PETER NORREGARD, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS AS TO GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GILMORE REFRIGERATION, INC SERVED ON 10/11/17 WITH FEES OF $82.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF GUY L. WARDEN & SONS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM COLLC TO COLL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GUY L. WARDEN & SONS FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0322 $435.00; 171004-0322-CK Reference Number CK 62928

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less