This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:46:47 (UTC).

WARD -V- RODGERS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 WARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODGERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1931

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERIE WARD

Defendant

TIFFANY D. RODGERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EWANISZYK LAW FIRM

14350 Civic Drive Ste 100

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant Attorney

GLUSKI, ESQ, MICHAEL G.

P.O. Box 52048

Phoenix, AZ 85072

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID 11053; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WALTER HOGAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHERIE WARD.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL GLUSKI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TIFFANY D. RODGERS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH COUNSEL..; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TIFFANY D. RODGERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY TIFFANY D. RODGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR TIFFANY D. RODGERS.; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0040 $150.00; 170511-0040-CK Reference Number D3553178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DEFENDANT TIFFANY D. RODGERS FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TIFFANY D. RODGERS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0038 $435.00; 170511-0038-CK Reference Number D3553177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • ANSWER FILED BY TIFFANY D. RODGERS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL G. GLUSKI, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CHERIE WARD FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHERIE WARD FOR NEW FILING/FAX/COPY/MAILING AND POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0323 $447.69; 170202-0323-VS Reference Number 026-0004544555

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.