This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 05:52:04 (UTC).

WARD-TEK VS. TURNER

Case Summary

On 01/11/2011 WARD-TEK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TURNER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WARD-TEK CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Defendants

JOANNE BALWOCHUS

WILLIAM F TURNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: ANNA VELASQUEZ; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WARD-TEK CONSTRUCTION, INC.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM F TURNER, JOANNE BALWOCHUS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; 10:19; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • FAXED SIGNED ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TO CHINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WARD-TEK CONSTRUCTION, INC., WILLIAM F TURNER, JOANNE BALWOCHUS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; PLAINTIFF SUBMITTED A WRITTEN REQUEST FOR A CONTINUANCE; THAT REQUEST IS NOW GRANTED; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/26/11 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2C.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY CLERKS OFFICE TO ALL PARTIES.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • FAXED REQUEST TO POSTPONE TO FONTANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110218-1874 $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110218-1871 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO WILLIAM F TURNER. PARTY SERVED ON 01/11/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $95.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO JOANNE BALWOCHUS. PARTY SERVED ON 01/11/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $95.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110118-4166 $30.00; 110118-4166-CK Reference Number 4172

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.