This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 05:11:03 (UTC).

WARD FAMILY TRUST-V-NOBLE

Case Summary

On 10/03/2012 WARD FAMILY TRUST-V-NOBLE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Powers, Margaret A and McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0056

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Powers, Margaret A

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE WARD FAMILY 1986 TRUST, AND THE SURVIORS TRUST & CREDIT SHELTER

Defendant

NOBLE, MILDRED

Not Classified By Court

NOBLE, MILDRED A

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRBY & MCGUINN

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED.(CCP708.160) 121005-050

10/03/2012: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED.(CCP708.160) 121005-050

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

10/03/2012: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

10/03/2012: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORAP NTC-TO ATTEND DECL BY PER

10/26/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORAP NTC-TO ATTEND DECL BY PER

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

03/18/2013: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 13031

03/19/2013: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 13031

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 13031

03/19/2013: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. 13031

DECLARATION OF ELAINE L. CHAN-APP-ORDER ORAP RE LO

03/19/2013: DECLARATION OF ELAINE L. CHAN-APP-ORDER ORAP RE LO

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE WARD FAMILY 1986

03/19/2013: POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE WARD FAMILY 1986

DECLARATION OF ELAINE L. CHAN-APP-ORDER ORAP RE W.

03/19/2013: DECLARATION OF ELAINE L. CHAN-APP-ORDER ORAP RE W.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE WARD FAMILY 1986

03/19/2013: POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY THE WARD FAMILY 1986

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SER

04/17/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SER

04/17/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SER

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

05/14/2013: CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

05/14/2013: CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/14/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2013

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD NO REPORTER AVAILABLE COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ELAINE CHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. SUBPOENAED THIRD PARTY: CARY LOPAS IS PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: 08:37 POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING ON: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION HELD CARY LOPAS PRESENT, DEBTOR SWORN AND INSTRUCTED BY THE COURT. - NOT REPORTED OR RECORDED 09:54 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION IS CONCLUDED ACTION - COMPLETE ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 07/19/13 ====

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2013

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ELAINE CHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. SUBPOENAED THIRD PARTY: WILLIAM LOPAS IS PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: 08:37 POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING ON: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION HELD WILLIAM LOPAS PRESENT, DEBTOR SWORN AND INSTRUCTED BY THE COURT. - JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION IS HELD WITHOUT FURTHER INTERVENTION BY THE COURT. - NOT REPORTED OR RECORDED 09:54 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION IS CONCLUDED ACTION - COMPLETE ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 06/28/13 ==== === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2013

DocketORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Original Type: ORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2013

DocketORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Original Type: ORAP -- Examination of Judgment Debtor; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2013
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/07/13 AS TO CARY LOPAS, FILED. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2013
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/07/13 AS TO WILLIAM B. LOPAS, FILED. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2013

DocketUpdate Jurisdiction to; Comment: UPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2013

DocketCase Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent; Comment: CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S36 FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
10/26/2012

DocketComment:; Comment: PRF OF SERVICE PLACED IN NEEDLES BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2012

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20121005-0506; ConversionPayment; $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2012

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2012

DocketComment:; Comment: ORAP PLACED IN NEEDLES BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (10/3/2012 - 0001 - OAEOUT OF COUNTY ABSTRACTS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $180.00; Total Payments and Credits: $180.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012
View Court Documents

DocketApplication for Order for Examination Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2012
View Court Documents

DocketAbstract of Judgment Filed; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED.(CCP708.160) 121005-0506-CK MMF/ 60.00 PAYMT 121005-0506-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 027332 JUDGMENT ON OUT OF COUNTY ABSTRACTS OF THE WARD FAMILY 1986 TRUST, AND THE ORDERED ENTERED 04/02/12 JUDGMENT FOR: THE WARD FAMILY 1986 TRUST, AND THE JUDGMENT AGAINST: MILDRED NOBLE STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less