This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:54:25 (UTC).

WALTER THOMAS (W.T.) COLLINS

Case Summary

On 12/28/2016 WALTER THOMAS W T COLLINS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1280

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHEA LEWIS

Decedent

WALTER THOMAS COLLINS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWEENEY, WILLIAM K

32371 Alipaz St. #29

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION W/WILL ANNEXED)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION W/WILL ANNEXED)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION W/WILL ANNEXED)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION W/WILL ANNEXED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/18 FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/18 FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS

HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH N/A IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, SHEA LEWIS APPOINTED WITH N/A IAEA. BOND IS NOT REQ., B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • PROBATE STATUS REPORT FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; WILLIAM SWEENEY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SHEA LEWIS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROBATE STATUS REPORT APPROVED. ORDER NOT SIGNED.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 06/26/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY SHEA LEWIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/27/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/27/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/21/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY SHEA LEWIS(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.