Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:35:54 (UTC).

WAHLER -V- FORUM ASSOCIATES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/27/2015 WAHLER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FORUM ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2427

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE WAHLER

VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT

Defendants

FORUM ASSOCIATES

WESTFORE

RICHARD G WAHLER

CATHY R HOLMES

LINDA J. VOLLAIRE

JUDITH M WAHLER

ROBERT G KUHN

GENERAL HOUSING CORP.,

ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CATHY R

ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE LINDA J

ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE ROBERT N

TRIPLE R, A CALIFORNIA GENERALPARTNERSHIP

ROBERT G. KUHN, ASTRUSTEE FORTHE RICHARD

ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RICHARD G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BULEY LAW APC

1300 Bristol St. North Suite 215

Newport Beach, CA 92660

STEPHENS FRIEDLANDLLP

2603 Main Street Ste 350

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorneys

DAILY LAW GROUP

600 Anton Blvd Ste 650

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

ANGELO & WHITE

610 Newport Center Drive Ste 1200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SUBMISSIONS OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

NOTICE OF SUBMISSIONS OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

NOTICE OF SUBMISSIONS OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

NOTICE OF SUBMISSIONS OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT FILED.

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT FILED.

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT FILED.

DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

STATEMENT OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST ESTABLISHED BY DEFS FILED.

STATEMENT OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST ESTABLISHED BY DEFS FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

DEFENDANTS FORUM SEPARATE STATEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

DEFENDANTS FORUM SEPARATE STATEMENTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED.

MOTION RE: AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/08/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/08/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/19/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/19/16, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

DEFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED.

DEFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER AND SPECIAL DEMURRER BY DEFTS SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER AND SPECIAL DEMURRER BY DEFTS SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CCCS, NTC OF TSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/30/15 AS TO WESTFORE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CCCS, NTC OF TSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/30/15 AS TO WESTFORE, FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER, CATHY R HOLMES, LINDA J. VOLLAIRE, GENERAL HOUSING CORP.,; REPRESENTED BY DAILY LAW GROUP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER, CATHY R HOLMES, LINDA J. VOLLAIRE, GENERAL HOUSING CORP.,; REPRESENTED BY DAILY LAW GROUP(IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/01/15 AS TO ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CATHY R HOLMES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/01/15 AS TO ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CATHY R HOLMES, FILED.

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF TERMINATION OF COORDINATED PROCEEDING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE FILED BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER, CATHY R HOLMES, LINDA J. VOLLAIRE, JUDITH M WAHLER, GENERAL HOUSING CORP.,, CAUSE 2,3,4, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • PARTY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT UPDATED: PARTY NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO FORUM ASSOCIATES, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER, CATHY R HOLMES, LINDA J. VOLLAIRE, JUDITH M WAHLER, GENERAL HOUSING CORP.,, TRIPLE R, A CALIFORNIA GENERALPARTNERSHIP. PARTY SERVED ON 03/01/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
198 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150827-2400 $435.00; 150827-2400-CK Reference Number #166716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/27/2015 OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT, ROBERT G KUHN, ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RICHARD G, ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE LINDA J, ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CATHY R, ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE ROBERT N IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/27/2015 OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT, GENERAL HOUSING CORP., IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • PARTY JUDITH M WAHLER UPDATED: NAME TO MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/27/2015 OF VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE ROBERT, WESTFORE, RICHARD G WAHLER, CATHY R HOLMES, LINDA J. VOLLAIRE, JUDITH M WAHLER IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • PARTY 0008 UPDATED: TO SHOW INDIVIDUALLY SUED & SUED AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • PARTY ROBERT G KUHN AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RICHARD G UPDATED: DEFENDANTS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTFORE is a litigant

Latest cases where VALAREE WAHLER, ASTRUSTEE OF THE WAHLER is a litigant

Latest cases where Robert A Ricciardelli Designer Llc is a litigant