This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 10:01:39 (UTC).

VRM -V- DORIAN / SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/27/2016 VRM filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DORIAN / SMITH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0498

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT)

Defendants

TUNISHA DORAN

JUSTIN SMITH

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, ROSENTHAL, W ITHEM & ZEFF

16255 Ventura Blvd, Suite 1016

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 2-1-17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 2-1-17)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/27/2016 OF VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT) ORDERED ENTERED 01/31/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT); JUDGMENT AGAINST: TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $21.78.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $21.78.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TUNISHA DORAN SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $141.73 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TUNISHA DORAN SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $141.73 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUSTIN SMITH SERVED ON 01/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $21.78 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUSTIN SMITH SERVED ON 01/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $21.78 FILED.

UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF ROSENTHAL, W ITHEM & ZEFF, ATTORNEY FOR VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT).

UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF ROSENTHAL, W ITHEM & ZEFF, ATTORNEY FOR VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT).

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161227-0622 $255.00; 161227-0622-CK Reference Number 49228

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0583 $25.00; 170208-0583-CK Reference Number 49269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 2-1-17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $100.00.--BEGINNING ON 11/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/27/2016 OF VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT) ORDERED ENTERED 01/31/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT); JUDGMENT AGAINST: TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/27/2016 OF VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT) AS TO TUNISHA DORAN, JUSTIN SMITH, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/04/17 WITH FEES OF $21.78.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/27/2016 OF VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT), ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TUNISHA DORAN SERVED ON 01/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $141.73 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JUSTIN SMITH SERVED ON 01/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $21.78 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UPDATE FIRM ADDRESS OF ROSENTHAL, W ITHEM & ZEFF, ATTORNEY FOR VRM (VENDOR RESOURCE MANAGEMENT).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161227-0622 $255.00; 161227-0622-CK Reference Number 49228

    Read MoreRead Less