This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:13:51 (UTC).

VITCO DISTRIBUTORS-V-PERUYERA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 VITCO DISTRIBUTORS-V-PERUYERA was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9447

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VITCO DISTRIBUTORS, INC

Defendant

ORLANDO PERUYERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JASON D. ANNIGIAN, APC

114 N Indian Hill Blvd Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

THE ANNIGIAN FIRM APC

114 N Indian Hill Blvd Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC ORDERED ENTERED 04/13/11; JUDGMENT FOR: VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ORLANDO PERUYERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $38,873.49 INTEREST $3,393.09 ATTORNEY FEES $875.00 COSTS $610.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $43,751.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON ANNIGIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT LAST WEEK.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(H).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/SANCTIONS SET FOR 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:58; ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION OF KOSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP FILED

DECLARATION OF KOSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP FILED

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LAW OFFICES OF JASON D. ANNIGIAN, APC FOR VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO THE ANNIGIAN FIRM APC FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LAW OFFICES OF JASON D. ANNIGIAN, APC FOR VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO THE ANNIGIAN FIRM APC FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ORLANDO PERUYERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ORLANDO PERUYERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/SANCTIONS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC ORDERED ENTERED 04/13/11; JUDGMENT FOR: VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ORLANDO PERUYERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $38,873.49 INTEREST $3,393.09 ATTORNEY FEES $875.00 COSTS $610.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $43,751.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JASON ANNIGIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; COUNSEL REPRESENTS THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT WAS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT LAST WEEK.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE REGARDING WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(H).; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT/SANCTIONS SET FOR 07/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:58; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KOSTAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT PROVE-UP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF LAW OFFICES OF JASON D. ANNIGIAN, APC FOR VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO THE ANNIGIAN FIRM APC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ORLANDO PERUYERA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC AS TO ORLANDO PERUYERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0040309089

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ORLANDO PERUYERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC FOR FAX FEES/ENVELOPE/POSTAGE/COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171106-0187 $4.21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VITCO DISTRIBUTORS,INC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0560 $435.00; 171004-0560-CK Reference Number 4257

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less