Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 19:04:39 (UTC).

VISTA VIEW-V-STEWART

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 VISTA VIEW-V-STEWART was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1906

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VISTA VIEW APARTMENTS

Defendant

DANIELLE STEWART

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSC.

3691 Adams St

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTNY BIJN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTNY BIJN); Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0059 $25.00; 170510-0059-CK Reference Number 66449

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT DANIELLE STEWART PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; JEZEBEL SALAZAR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; WITNESS -- DANIELLE STEWART IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/21/2017 OF VISTA VIEW APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 05/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VISTA VIEW APARTMENTS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIELLE STEWART; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,235.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $1,339.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,439.80; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DANIELLE STEWART, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:16; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/28/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/28/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY DANIELLE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY DANIELLE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0268 $255.00; 170321-0268-CK Reference Number 66046

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN ATTNY BIJN); Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0059 $25.00; 170510-0059-CK Reference Number 66449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • WRIT OF POSS/712 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT DANIELLE STEWART PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; JEZEBEL SALAZAR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; WITNESS -- DANIELLE STEWART IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/21/2017 OF VISTA VIEW APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 05/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VISTA VIEW APARTMENTS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIELLE STEWART; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,235.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $1,339.80.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,439.80; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DANIELLE STEWART, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:16; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • POS/DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DANIELLE STEWART IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DANIELLE STEWART FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DANIELLE STEWART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DANIELLE STEWART; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DANIELLE STEWART FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0726 $0.74; 170327-0726-CS Reference Number CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.60.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170321-0268 $255.00; 170321-0268-CK Reference Number 66046

    Read MoreRead Less