This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/19/2021 at 14:47:35 (UTC).

VION HOLDINGS LLC -V- SIOBHAIN STEILEN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 VION HOLDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIOBHAIN STEILEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0030

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/03/2012

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2012

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2011

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2011

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2011

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CASE COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketUnserved; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 06/02/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SIOBHAIN STEILEN.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketUnserved; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 06/02/2011; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JUSTIN ROYCE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketProof of Service UNSERVED Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SIOBHAIN STEILEN.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketProof of Service UNSERVED Filed; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JUSTIN ROYCE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
05/04/2011

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $380.00; Total Payments and Credits: $380.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketFiling Fees Due to the Court on or Before; Comment: FILING FEES OF $40.00 DUE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 05/24/11. IF A HEARING HAS BEEN SET, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE FEES ONE DAY PRIOR TO THE HEARING.VION HOLDINGS LLC confidential minute: NOTICE PRINTED FOR S O BARNES LAW OFFICE OF CURTI ON 5/04/11.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketFiling Fees Due to the Court on or Before; Comment: FILING FEES OF $40.00 DUE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 05/24/11. IF A HEARING HAS BEEN SET, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE FEES ONE DAY PRIOR TO THE HEARING.VION HOLDINGS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY VION HOLDINGS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketParties Referred to Alternate Dispute Resolution; Comment: PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2011

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 110504-2471-CK CVM/ 340.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less