This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:26:31 (UTC).

VINNOVA VS KOHSH

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 VINNOVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KOHSH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7511

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VINNOVA,INC.

Defendant

KOHSH GROUP,INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VINNOVA,INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VINNOVA,INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KOHSH GROUP,INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KOHSH GROUP,INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0805 $50.00; 171004-0805-VS Reference Number 031-0048711929

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VINNOVA,INC.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KOHSH GROUP,INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:25; MOTION; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR KOHSH GROUP INC FILED.

SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR KOHSH GROUP INC FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VINNOVA,INC.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KOHSH GROUP,INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:25; MOTION; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: LACK OF PROSECUTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VINNOVA,INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; VINNOVA,INC. REPRESENTED BY FRANCES CHEN.; KOHSH GROUP,INC. REPRESENTED BY FRANCIS LEE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NOT REPORTED; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/12/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F2.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SECOND PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR KOHSH GROUP INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME MUST MATCH COMPLAINT EXACTLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KOHSH GROUP,INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VINNOVA,INC. FOR FAXES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0817 $6.00; 171004-0817-VS Reference Number 031-0048711929

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0805 $50.00; 171004-0805-VS Reference Number 031-0048711929

    Read MoreRead Less