This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 01:11:09 (UTC).

VINEYARD BANK -V- MARK NEUDORFF

Case Summary

On 07/14/2011 VINEYARD BANK filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MARK NEUDORFF. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brisco, Joseph R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6540

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Brisco, Joseph R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VINEYARD BANK N A

Respondents

MARK G NEUDORFF

EMILIA M NEUDORFF

NEUDORFF, MARK G

NEUDORFF, EMILIA M

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LANPHERE LAW GROUP

Attorney at Lanphere Law Group

400 N Tustin Avenue Suite 225

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED;

04/02/2012: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED;

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY VINEYARD BANK

10/14/2011: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY VINEYARD BANK

JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF

09/16/2011: JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF

NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING ON PETITION (ARBITRATION)

08/17/2011: NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING ON PETITION (ARBITRATION)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL) 110714-3431-CK CVG- 395.

07/14/2011: PETITION FILED (CIVIL) 110714-3431-CK CVG- 395.

NOTICE IMAGED

07/14/2011: NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketJudgment Filed - Status is now:; Comment: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied; Comment: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY VINEYARD BANK N A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Brisco, Joseph R; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (7/14/2011 - 0001 - MPUMisc. Petition - Civil (Unlimited)); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: VINEYARD BANK N A; Awarded Against; NEUDORFF, EMILIA M; NEUDORFF, MARK G; Amount; Damages: $0.00; Pre-Judgment Interest: $42,780.00; Attorney Fees: $18,101.00; Costs: $14,409.47; Other: $171,758.09; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $247048.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Brisco, Joseph R; Comment: STATUS HEARING ON PETITION JOSEPH R. BRISCO,JUDGE CLERK: CHRISTINA L. BANDFIELD COURT REPORTER NANCY HERALDEZ;8191 COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY AARON B FAIRCHILD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. - JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF VINEYARD BANK N A ORDERED ENTERED 09/16/11 JUDGMENT FOR: VINEYARD BANK N A JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARK G NEUDORFF, EMILIA M NEUDORFF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $171,758.09 INTEREST $42,780.00 ATTORNEY FEES $18,101.00 COSTS $14,409.47 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $247048.56 JUDGMENT SIGNED. COPIES GIVEN TO PARTIES/COUNSEL. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment on Complaint Filed; Comment: JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF VINEYARD BANK N A FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DocketStatus Hearing on Petition; Original Type: Status Hearing on Petition; Judicial Officer: Brisco, Joseph R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: STATUS HEARING ON PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF STATUS HEARING ON PETITION (ARBITRATION) FILED BY VINEYARD BANK N A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20110714-3431; ConversionPayment; $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $395.00; Total Payments and Credits: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketSet Default Department to; Comment: SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO R10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed (Civil); Comment: PETITION FILED (CIVIL) 110714-3431-CK CVG/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vineyard Bank NA is a litigant