This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 21:40:01 (UTC).

VINCENT MORENO-V-VERONICA REYES

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 VINCENT MORENO-V-VERONICA REYES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1065

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RON MORENO

VINCENT MORNEO

VINCENT MORENO

Defendants

VERONICA REYES

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FURTHER HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FURTHER HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO PRESENT; DEFENDANT VERONICA REYES PRESENT; GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY REPRESENTED BY JULIE THACH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AT THE PREVIOUS HEARING THE COURT HEARD ALL TESTIMONY PERTAINING TO THE CASE WITH THE; EXCEPTION OF GEICO.; JULIE THACH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR GEICO.; WITNESS -- VERONICA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; GEICO REQUESTS TO BE DISMISSED FROM CASE; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; BY WAY OF DECLARATORY RELIEF: JUDGMENT IS FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF IS ONLY LIABLE TO DEFENDANT; GEICO AND REYES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2100 OF WHICH $800 HAS BEEN PAID TO DEFENDANT VERONICA REYES,; LEAVING BALANCE OF $1300. GEICO IS BOUND BY ITS INSURED AS TO THE EXTENT OF PLAINTIFFS; LIABILITY. DEFENDANT REYES, DID NOT FILE A DEFENDANTS CLAIN, NO AWARD IS MADE TO HER; WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 06/19/2017 OF VINCENT MORENO ORDERED ENTERED 09/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA REYES, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 9/25/17 MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/MINUTE ORDER FROM 8/28/17 TRIAL FILED AS TO GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 09/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $129.50. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/MINUTE ORDER FROM 8/28/17 TRIAL FILED AS TO GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 09/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $129.50. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:33; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO PRESENT; DEFENDANT VERONICA REYES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; WITNESS -- RON MORENO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- VERONICA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; THE COURT IS UNABLE TO FULLY RESOLVE THIS DISPUTE WITHOUT DEFENDANTS INSURANCE COMPANY AS A PARTY; TO THIS ACTION. PLAINTIFF HAS 45 DAYS WITHIN WHICH TO AMEND THEIR CLAIM AND NAME DEFENDANTS; INSURANCE CARRIER AS A PARTY TO THIS ACTION AND HAVE THEM PROPERLY SERVED. THIS MATTER IS SET; FOR FURTHER HEARING ON MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 25, 2017 AT 8:30 A.M. PLAINTIFF IS TO HAVE THEIR; CLAIM AMENDED, INCLUDING NOTICE OF THIS HEARING DATE, AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITH THE COURT,; AT LEAST, 10 DAYS PRIOR TO THAT COURT DATE. IN THE EVENT PLAINTIFF FAILS TO AMEND AND SERVE ITS; CLAIM AS PROVIDED FOR, THIS ACTION MAY BE DISMISSED AT THAT HEARING. SERVICE OF THIS; MINUTE ORDER UPON DEFENDANT SHALL CONSTITUTE NOTICE OF THAT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : FURTHER HEARING SET FOR 09/25/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 8/28/17 MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO VERONICA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 08/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO VERONICA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 08/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VERONICA REYES WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VERONICA REYES WITH COSTS OF $40.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170619-0220 $32.50; 170619-0220-DB Reference Number 026-0052765929

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 10/04/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEC & ORDER RE:SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS FORM MUST BE SERVED TO THE OTHER PARTIES ON T HE CASE-F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FURTHER HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:48; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO PRESENT; DEFENDANT VERONICA REYES PRESENT; GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY REPRESENTED BY JULIE THACH.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AT THE PREVIOUS HEARING THE COURT HEARD ALL TESTIMONY PERTAINING TO THE CASE WITH THE; EXCEPTION OF GEICO.; JULIE THACH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR GEICO.; WITNESS -- VERONICA REYES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; GEICO REQUESTS TO BE DISMISSED FROM CASE; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; COURT FINDS:; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; BY WAY OF DECLARATORY RELIEF: JUDGMENT IS FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF IS ONLY LIABLE TO DEFENDANT; GEICO AND REYES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2100 OF WHICH $800 HAS BEEN PAID TO DEFENDANT VERONICA REYES,; LEAVING BALANCE OF $1300. GEICO IS BOUND BY ITS INSURED AS TO THE EXTENT OF PLAINTIFFS; LIABILITY. DEFENDANT REYES, DID NOT FILE A DEFENDANTS CLAIN, NO AWARD IS MADE TO HER; WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 06/19/2017 OF VINCENT MORENO ORDERED ENTERED 09/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA REYES, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 9/25/17 MINUTES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VINCENT MORENO, RON MORENO FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170919-0608 $3.00; 170919-0608-MC Reference Number 026-0068517176

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM & ORDER/MINUTE ORDER FROM 8/28/17 TRIAL FILED AS TO GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 09/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $129.50. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VINCENT MORENO FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0795 $7.00; 170914-0795-DB Reference Number 026-0067732827

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VINCENT MORENO FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0647 $6.00; 170814-0647-MC Reference Number 026 0062355777

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO VERONICA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 08/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VINCENT MORENO FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0015 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PARTY VINCENT MORENO UPDATED: CORRECT CASE NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO VERONICA REYES WITH COSTS OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170619-0220 $32.50; 170619-0220-DB Reference Number 026-0052765929

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.