This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:45:14 (UTC).

VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA -V- LAURA RAE WAGNER

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAURA RAE WAGNER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2031

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA

Respondent

LAURA RAE WAGNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/03/2017 OF VINCENT CAMPAGNA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/03/2017 OF VINCENT CAMPAGNA ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA FOR FNL WVD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 08/14/17 BY VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LAURA RAE WAGNER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/03/2017 OF VINCENT CAMPAGNA AS TO LAURA RAE WAGNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LAURA RAE WAGNER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON VINCENT JAMES CAMPAGNA FOR FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.