This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 14:46:43 (UTC).

VILLANUEVA -V- J&J SNACK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 VILLANUEVA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against J J SNACK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Davis, Keith D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9864

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Davis, Keith D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANDELARIA VILLANUEVA

VILLANUEVA, CANDELARIA

Defendants

J&J SNACK FOODS CORP. OF CALIFORNIA

HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC.

STAY SAFE STAFFINGINC.

STAY SAFE STAFFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

J&J SNACK FOODS CORP. OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HORIZON PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA CHURROS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILON PLUAS LLP

Attorney at MILON PLUAS LLP

909 East Green Street

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendant Attorneys

OGLETREE,DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART,P.C

695 Town Center Drive Park Tower, Suite 1500

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart

Epstein Becker & Green PC

Attorney at Epstein Becker & Green PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

11/06/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. ON 08-19-19 CIV

06/02/2020: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. ON 08-19-19 CIV

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING OGLE

10/15/2019: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING OGLE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING OGLE

10/15/2019: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING OGLE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

09/24/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS SET F

08/06/2019: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS SET F

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE- RELATING TO CIVDS1710291 F

07/05/2019: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE- RELATING TO CIVDS1710291 F

MOTION RE- TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS (W- CIVDS1710291

07/05/2019: MOTION RE- TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS (W- CIVDS1710291

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

07/05/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY J&J SNACK FOODS CORP. OF CALIFORNI

05/23/2019: ANSWER FILED BY J&J SNACK FOODS CORP. OF CALIFORNI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON J&J SN

04/24/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON J&J SN

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

04/24/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

04/24/2019: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

NOTICE IMAGED

04/02/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

04/02/2019: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

04/02/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

04/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

04/02/2019: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: NTC OF COURTS ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEEDS TO BE FILED INTO CONSOLIDATED CASE CIVDS1710291.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Sent re:; Comment: NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT. ON 08/19/19 CIVDS1909864 IS ORDERED CONSOLIDATEDWITH CIVDS1710291. MASTER FILE CASE NUMBER IS CIVDS1710291. ALL DOCUMENTS MUST BE FILE UNDER THE MASTER FILE #CIVDS1710291 NOTICES PRINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART WITH EPSTEIN BECKER & GREEN PC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR J&J SNACK FOODS CORP. OF CALIFORNIA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL FILINGS MUST BE UNDER MASTER FILE CASE # CIVDS1710291.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,839.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,839.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF CANDELARIA VILLANUEVA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY CANDELARIA VILLANUEVA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 190402-0349-VS CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190402-0349-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0119916565

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less