This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:15:43 (UTC).

VILLAGE -V- LUCKETT

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 VILLAGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUCKETT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2085

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAGE SQUARE APARTMENTS

Defendant

TYZSHAWN LUCKETT

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE; Disposition: Dismissed; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER TERESA HIGH 11048; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 09:19; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT, JR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF VILLAGE SQUARE APARTMENTS.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: STIPULATION HAS BEEN COMPLIED WITH.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL AFTER COURT TRIAL; DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL AFTER COURT TRIAL; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT TYZSHAWN LUCKETT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY WILLIAM M GARRETT ON 07/18/11 AS TO TYZSHAWN LUCKETT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; CHERYL HOUDE, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM M. GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TYZSHAWN LUCKETT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; DEFENDANT HAS NOT FULLY COMPLIED WITH THE TERMS OF THE AGREEMENT HOWEVER COUNSEL BELIEVES HE; WILL COMPLY AND REQUESTS MATTER BE CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/08/11 AT 07:45 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 08:28; NOT REPORTED; MINUTES UPDATED BY JESSICA GABLE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM M GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT - TYZSHAWN LUCKETT PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- TYZSHAWN LUCKETT IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VILLAGE SQUARE APARTMENTS ORDERED ENTERED 06/06/11; JUDGMENT FOR 08/08/11.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 08/08/11; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TYZSHAWN LUCKETT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $750.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $295.00 AND DAMAGES $912.42.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,357.42; A SECURITY DEPOSIT OF $800.00 IS ACKNOWLEDGED PURS. CC 1950.5(E).; NO NEGATIVE CREDIT REPORTING PURSUANT TO CC 1786.18(A)(4).; PARTIES HAVE STIPULATED THAT THERE WILL BE A STAY AS TO POSSESSION SO LONG AS THE DEFENDANT PAYS BY; CERTIFIED FUNDS AS FOLLOWS:; $1600.00 ON 06/06/11 (RECEIPT OF FUNDS IS ACKNOWLEDGED BY COUNSEL IN OPEN COURT). $1100.00; TO BE PAID ON 06/10/11 AND $1000.00 TO BE PAID ON 07/10/11.IF ALL PAYMENTS ARE MADE JUDGMENT WILL; BE SET ASIDE AND CASE DISMISSED. IF ANY PAYMENT IS NOT TIMELY/RECEIVED A WRIT MAY ISSUE BY; DECLARATION.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : COMPLIANCE SET FOR 07/18/11 AT 07:45 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET/EXHIBITS REFERRED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/08/11 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TYZSHAWN LUCKETT; PARTY SERVED ON 05/08/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • EXHIBITS REFERRED TO IN COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY TYZSHAWN LUCKETT IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TYZSHAWN LUCKETT FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY TYZSHAWN LUCKETT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY TYZSHAWN LUCKETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VILLAGE SQUARE APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $24.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2632 $255.00; 110504-2632-CK Reference Number 42276

    Read MoreRead Less