This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 06:38:48 (UTC).

VILLAGE CROSSING V DAVIS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2011 VILLAGE CROSSING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0132

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAGE CROSSING AT CHINO HILLS

Defendants

ANITA DAVIS

STANLEY GATHERS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA & WALLACE,LLP

16520 Bake Pkwy. Suite 280

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED WHOLLY UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 110.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110328-2356 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 03/01/2011 OF VILLAGE CROSSING ATCHINO HILLS ORDERED ENTERED 03/28/11; JUDGMENT FOR: VILLAGE CROSSING ATCHINO HILLS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANITA DAVIS, STANLEY GATHERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VILLAGE CROSSING ATCHINO HILLS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/07/11 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANITA DAVIS, STANLEY GATHERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/01/2011 OF VILLAGE CROSSING ATCHINO HILLS AS TO ANITA DAVIS, STANLEY GATHERS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/01/2011 OF VILLAGE CROSSING ATCHINO HILLS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO STANLEY GATHERS SERVED ON 03/07/11 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ANITA DAVIS SERVED ON 03/07/11 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110302-3228 $255.00; 110302-3228-CK Reference Number 330315

    Read MoreRead Less