This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:51:11 (UTC).

VILLACIS VS RIDDLE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 VILLACIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RIDDLE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5330

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JULIO VILLACIS

Defendant

ELAINNA E RIDDLE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL L BRISSON

112 Harvard Avenue #103

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0434 $25.00; 170907-0434-CK Reference Number 1603

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/28/2017 OF JULIO VILLACIS ORDERED ENTERED 08/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JULIO VILLACIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELAINNA E RIDDLE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ELAINNA E RIDDLE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ELAINNA E RIDDLE.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ELAINNA E RIDDLE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ELAINNA E RIDDLE; POSTED ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ELAINNA E RIDDLE; POSTED ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 170907-0434 $25.00; 170907-0434-CK Reference Number 1603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • 712/WRIT-PRIORITY RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/28/2017 OF JULIO VILLACIS ORDERED ENTERED 08/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JULIO VILLACIS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELAINNA E RIDDLE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ELAINNA E RIDDLE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/28/2017 OF JULIO VILLACIS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/03/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ELAINNA E RIDDLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/28/2017 OF JULIO VILLACIS AS TO ELAINNA E RIDDLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $91.66.--BEGINNING ON 08/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170728-0449 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRISSON PAUL