This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:03:55 (UTC).

VILLA -V- MEDINA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 VILLA -V- MEDINA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7665

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUAN VILLA

Defendant

ELIAS MEDINA

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELIAS MEDINA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELIAS MEDINA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER NOT RECORDED; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/LACK OF PROSECUTION.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JUAN VILLA PRESENT; DEFENDANT ELIAS MEDINA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/16/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ELIAS MEDINA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/09/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JUAN VILLA FOR SMALL CLAIM NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JUAN VILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JUAN VILLA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less