This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:15:24 (UTC).

VILLA DEL LAGO VS OEFFINGER

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 VILLA DEL LAGO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OEFFINGER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7807

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

KAREN OEFFINGER

KELLY M OEFFINGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE

1111 E. Katella Ave Suite 200

Orange, CA 92867

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • STIPULATION RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ORDERED ENTERED 05/13/18; JUDGMENT FOR: VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KAREN OEFFINGER, KELLY M OEFFINGER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,062.95 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,062.95; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DEFENDANT KAREN OEFFINGER, KELLY M OEFFINGER FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180503-0056 $20.00; 180503-0056-CK Reference Number 27499

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KAREN OEFFINGER, KELLY M OEFFINGER FOR FIRST APP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180503-0048 $480.00; 180503-0048-CK Reference Number 27502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT/ TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:12; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF.; SETTLEMENT REACHED; STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT TO BE FILED; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL RE CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT/TSC SET FOR 06/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:11; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER HAS NOT EXPIRED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DEFAULT/ TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KELLY M OEFFINGER SERVED ON 02/06/18 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0595 $240.00; 170918-0595-CK Reference Number 26327

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,462.65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less