This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:57:48 (UTC).

VILLA DEL LAGO -V- PSALMS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 VILLA DEL LAGO -V- PSALMS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7983

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLA DEL LAGO AT LABAND VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

MARCUS PSALMS

CHRISTINA PSALMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE

1111 E. Katella Avenue Suite 200

Orange, CA 92867

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARCUS PSALMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARCUS PSALMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHRISTINA PSALMS SERVED ON 12/21/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHRISTINA PSALMS SERVED ON 12/21/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0637 $240.00; 170918-0637-CK Reference Number 26328

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHRISTINA PSALMS SERVED ON 12/21/17 WITH FEES OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MARCUS PSALMS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/17/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 12 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 01/01/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,335.22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0637 $240.00; 170918-0637-CK Reference Number 26328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less