This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 02:22:54 (UTC).

VIGOA -V- COLBERT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 VIGOA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLBERT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1425

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARNALDO VIGOA

LISA VIGOA

Defendant

VERNICE COLBERT

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES

3691 Adams Street

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/26/2017 OF ARNALDO VIGOA ORDERED ENTERED 07/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ARNALDO VIGOA, LISA VIGOA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/26/2017 OF ARNALDO VIGOA ORDERED ENTERED 07/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ARNALDO VIGOA, LISA VIGOA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERNICE COLBERT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERNICE COLBERT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERNICE COLBERT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERNICE COLBERT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/01/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/01/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VERNICE COLBERT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.50

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VERNICE COLBERT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.50

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170626-0830 $255.00; 170626-0830-CK Reference Number 66958

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/26/2017 OF ARNALDO VIGOA ORDERED ENTERED 07/19/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ARNALDO VIGOA, LISA VIGOA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VERNICE COLBERT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARNALDO VIGOA FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0841 $25.00; 170721-0841-CK Reference Number 67467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERNICE COLBERT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/26/2017 OF ARNALDO VIGOA AS TO VERNICE COLBERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/01/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/26/2017 OF ARNALDO VIGOA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VERNICE COLBERT; PARTY SERVED ON 07/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $42.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $30.41.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170626-0830 $255.00; 170626-0830-CK Reference Number 66958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.