This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 08:38:11 (UTC).

VICTORVILLE/DESERT -V- SWAGERTY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2015 VICTORVILLE/DESERT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SWAGERTY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0450

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP

Defendant

TYKIA L SWAGERTY

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S ASHTON

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST OR UNAVAILABLE RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST OR UNAVAILABLE RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/23/2015 OF VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TYKIA L SWAGERTY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $526.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $350.00 COSTS $605.00 AND DAMAGES $732.06.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,213.06; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT FWD TO SCS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT FWD TO SCS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 150320-1789 $25.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/23/2015 OF VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP ORDERED ENTERED 03/19/15; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TYKIA L SWAGERTY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TYKIA L SWAGERTY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TYKIA L SWAGERTY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON TYKIA L SWAGERTY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TYKIA L SWAGERTY; POSTED ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TYKIA L SWAGERTY; POSTED ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150223-1317 $255.00; 150223-1317-CK Reference Number 503012

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST OR UNAVAILABLE RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/23/2015 OF VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TYKIA L SWAGERTY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $526.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $350.00 COSTS $605.00 AND DAMAGES $732.06.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,213.06; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT FWD TO SCS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 150320-1789 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TYKIA L SWAGERTY; POSTED ON 03/03/15 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/23/2015 OF VICTORVILLE/DERET SPRINGS, LP, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150303-2055 $20.00; 150303-2055-CK Reference Number 503275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $526.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $17.43.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 150223-1317 $255.00; 150223-1317-CK Reference Number 503012

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.