This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 02:08:40 (UTC).

VICTORIA SERNA -V- ANGELICA CAMPOS (MF)

Case Summary

On 12/07/2016 VICTORIA SERNA filed an Other lawsuit against ANGELICA CAMPOS MF. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0384

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

ROBERT MADRIGAL

VICTORIA SERNA

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

MARIA GUADALUPE CLAUDIO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JESUS RODRIGUEZ

ROBERT MADRIGAL

GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ

ANGELICA CAMPOS

ROBERT MADRIGAL JR

ROBERT ANTHONY MADRIGAL

ANGELICA ELAINE CAMPOS

JESUS MANUEL RODRIGUEZ

BRIAN ROBLEDO

JESUS MADRIGAL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ANGELICA CAMPOS

ROBERT MADRIGAL JR

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW J HAYNAL

25757 Redlands Blvd

Redlands, CA 92373-8453

RIZIO LAW FIRM, PC

2677 North Main Street Suite 225

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BENSON LEGAL APC

6345 Balboa Boulevard Building 3 Suite 365

Encino, CA 91316

LAW OFFICES OF GILBERT QUINONES

206 So. Stimson Avenue

La Puente, CA 91744

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

THARPE & HOWELL

15250 Ventura Blvd 9Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

P.O. Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW W. MACRAE

2677 North Main Street Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL JR, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL JR, WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/05/2017 OF MARIA CLAUDIO FILED BY MARIA GUADALUPE CLAUDIO, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/05/2017 OF MARIA CLAUDIO FILED BY MARIA GUADALUPE CLAUDIO, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF MARIA GUADALUPE CLAUDIO, ON 05/09/18

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JESUS MANUEL RODRIGUEZ, GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO JESUS MANUEL RODRIGUEZ, GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ

MINUTE ORDER RE: HEARING RE: RELATED CASES (IMAGED)

MINUTE ORDER RE: HEARING RE: RELATED CASES (IMAGED); Minutes; SEE FILE FOR DETAILED MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/05/2017 OF MARIA CLAUDIO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/05/2017 OF MARIA CLAUDIO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

MINUTE ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (IMAGED)

MINUTE ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (IMAGED); Minutes; SEE FILE FOR DETAILED MINUTE ORDER

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESUS MANUEL RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON 08/05/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESUS MANUEL RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON 08/05/17 WITH FEES OF $65.50.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 1 TO BE GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JESUS RODRIGUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

ANSWER FILED BY JESUS RODRIGUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/19/2017 OF ROBERT MADRIGAL BY ANGELICA CAMPOS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/19/2017 OF ROBERT MADRIGAL BY ANGELICA CAMPOS

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/07/2016 OF VICTORIA SERNA BY ROBERT MADRIGAL JR

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/07/2016 OF VICTORIA SERNA BY ROBERT MADRIGAL JR

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL SERVED ON 12/23/16 WITH FEES OF $65.54.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL SERVED ON 12/23/16 WITH FEES OF $65.54.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HALA MOUSA PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF:; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ROBERT MADRIGAL, ON 08/22/18; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF ANGELICA CAMPOS FILED BY ANGELICA CAMPOS, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ANGELICA CAMPOS, ON 07/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 01/19/2017 OF ROBERT MADRIGAL FILED BY ROBERT MADRIGAL JR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF ROBERT MADRIGAL JR, ON 07/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 12/07/2016 OF VICTORIA SERNA FILED BY VICTORIA SERNA, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF VICTORIA SERNA, ON 06/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL JR, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY AARON HICKS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VICTORIA SERNA.; ATTORNEY PATRICK J. SARKISSIAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANGELICA CAMPOS SERVED ON 12/22/16 WITH FEES OF $90.54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT MADRIGAL SERVED ON 12/23/16 WITH FEES OF $65.54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GABRIEL RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/16/16 WITH COSTS OF $103.90 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JESUS RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/22/16 WITH COSTS OF $63.90 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161207-0221 $435.00; 161207-0221-CK Reference Number 176419

    Read MoreRead Less