This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 16:59:24 (UTC).

VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-TAYLER FULLER

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-TAYLER FULLER was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0235

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

TAYLER NIKOL FULLER

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3107 $30.00; 160201-3107-CK Reference Number 2305

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TAYLER NIKOL FULLER; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; TAYLER NIKOL FULLER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; CHRISTI BOMORTINO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST TAYLER NIKOL FULLER.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAYLER NIKOL FULLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $916.52 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $946.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO TAYLER NIKOL FULLER. PARTY SERVED ON 02/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO TAYLER NIKOL FULLER. PARTY SERVED ON 02/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2026
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 04/09/26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TAYLER NIKOL FULLER; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; TAYLER NIKOL FULLER HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; CHRISTI BOMORTINO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST TAYLER NIKOL FULLER.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAYLER NIKOL FULLER; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $916.52 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $946.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO TAYLER NIKOL FULLER. PARTY SERVED ON 02/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3107 $30.00; 160201-3107-CK Reference Number 2305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less