This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 16:59:10 (UTC).

VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-BARRY HOPKINS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-BARRY HOPKINS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0234

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

BARRY M HOPKINS

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3026 $30.00; 160201-3026-CK Reference Number 2304

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:09; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, BARRY M HOPKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CHRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BARRY M HOPKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:43; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUEST CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/13/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:09; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, BARRY M HOPKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CHRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BARRY M HOPKINS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:43; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUEST CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/13/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3026 $30.00; 160201-3026-CK Reference Number 2304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less