This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 16:59:38 (UTC).

VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-ANDREA CASTRO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 VICTOR VALLEY FCU-V-ANDREA CASTRO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0236

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ANDREA CASTRO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO ANDREA CASTRO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $80.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO ANDREA CASTRO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $80.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:09; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, ANDREA CASTRO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3151 $30.00; 160201-3151-CK Reference Number 2306

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CHRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREA CASTRO; PROCEEDINGS:; 09:46; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUEST CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/13/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:09; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, ANDREA CASTRO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO ANDREA CASTRO. PARTY SERVED ON 04/22/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $80.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; VICTOR VALLEY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION REPRESENTED BY CHRISTI BOMORTINO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREA CASTRO; PROCEEDINGS:; 09:46; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NO SERVICE; PLAINTIFF REQUEST CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/13/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-3151 $30.00; 160201-3151-CK Reference Number 2306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less