This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 07:37:57 (UTC).

VICTOR V HOMES -V- SANCHEZ ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/01/2017 VICTOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOMES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1843

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR V HOMES LLC

Defendants

KENNETH SANCHEZ

JULIE SANCHEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

ORDER LOST ORIGINAL LEASE GRANTED FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER LOST ORIGINAL LEASE GRANTED FILED (IMAGED)

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF VICTOR V HOMES LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR V HOMES LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $1,560.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,135.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY VICTOR V HOMES LLC

DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY VICTOR V HOMES LLC

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR V HOMES LLC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR V HOMES LLC.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170816-0852 $25.00; 170816-0852-CK Reference Number 1177429

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF VICTOR V HOMES LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR V HOMES LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/01/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JULIE SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JULIE SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0579 $255.00; 170801-0579-CK Reference Number 1177139

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • COPIES IN SASE TO ATTRNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER LOST ORIGINAL LEASE GRANTED FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF VICTOR V HOMES LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: VICTOR V HOMES LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,600.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $1,560.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,135.00; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL LEASE FILED BY VICTOR V HOMES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 09/08/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $575.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR VICTOR V HOMES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ, JULIE SANCHEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KENNETH SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JULIE SANCHEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/01/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/01/2017 OF VICTOR V HOMES LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.00.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170801-0579 $255.00; 170801-0579-CK Reference Number 1177139

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.