This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 06:33:58 (UTC).

VESTAR VS FLOR

Case Summary

On 02/05/2010 VESTAR filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against FLOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0066

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VESTAR-CHINO A LLC

Defendant

PAUL M FLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEWLEY, LASSLEBEN & MILLER

13215 E Penn St., Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2011
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 71008 ON 11/03/11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DISMISSAL REQUEST IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ON 03/05/10 AT THE STATUS CONFERENCE THE CASE WAS DISMISSED BY THE COURT DUE TO NO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VESTAR-CHINO A LLC FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 100318-2144 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT PRESIDING.; CLERK: SILVIA SPRIGGS; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: VESTAR-CHINO A LLC; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PAUL M FLOR; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VESTAR-CHINO A LLC FOR FAX FILING OF DISMISSAL; Minutes; Receipt: 100303-3554 $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING RETURNED RTN TO SNDR/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VESTAR-CHINO A LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100205-1474 $235.00; 100205-1474-CK Reference Number 020724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.