Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 00:20:43 (UTC).

VERNON-V-ZAVALA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 VERNON-V-ZAVALA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0485

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA

LEON DE LA CRUZ

DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH

DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANFORD A KASSEL ESQ.

334 West Third Street Suite 207

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DWAYNE S. BECK & ASSOCIATES, APC

6830 Palm Ave

Riverside, CA 92506

LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR

1851 E First Street Suite 440

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2015 OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2015 OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH, ON 02/23/16

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON

ANSWER FILED BY RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, LEON DE LA CRUZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DWAYNE S. BECK & ASSOCIATES, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, LEON DE LA CRUZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DWAYNE S. BECK & ASSOCIATES, APC.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2015 OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2015 OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/27/2015 OF NICHOLE VERNON BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/27/2015 OF NICHOLE VERNON BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH

ANSWER FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR.

ANSWER FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBRAUGH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/01/2015 OF RUTH ZAVALA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/01/2015 OF RUTH ZAVALA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

ANSWER FILED BY RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, LEON DE LA CRUZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DWAYNE S. BECK & ASSOCIATES, APC.

ANSWER FILED BY RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, LEON DE LA CRUZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DWAYNE S. BECK & ASSOCIATES, APC.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA SERVED ON 08/25/15 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA SERVED ON 08/25/15 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEON DE LA CRUZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEON DE LA CRUZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2015 OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH FILED BY DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF DOROTHY BUTERBAUGH, ON 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/01/2015 OF RUTH ZAVALA FILED BY RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF RUTH RAMOS ZAVALA, ON 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CROSS COMPLAINANTS MUST SIGN OFF TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/21/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LEON DE LA CRUZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/24/15 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NICHOLE HUNTER VERNON FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 150727-2256 $435.00; 150727-2256-CK Reference Number 52358

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM PIMVL TO PIMV

    Read MoreRead Less