This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:49:22 (UTC).

VERNON JACKSON, ET AL V BOBBY RAE WATKINS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 VERNON JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BOBBY RAE WATKINS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9624

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APRIL DAVIS

VERNON JACKSON

VERNON JACKSON II

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC.

RODRIGO CARANIBOA

BOBBY RAE WATKINS

RODRIGO BOA

UPS GROUND FREIGHT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICKSON KOHAN & BABLOVE LLP

1101 Dove Street Suite 220

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARANGA & MORGENSTERN

5850 Canoga Avenue Suite 600

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR & COHEN

3700 Central Ave 3Rd Floor

Riverside, CA 92506

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGO BOA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGO BOA.

ANSWER FILED BY RODRIGO BOA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

ANSWER FILED BY RODRIGO BOA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF TRAIL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC., RODRIGO BOA.

NOTICE OF TRAIL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC., RODRIGO BOA.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VERNON JACKSON BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VERNON JACKSON BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS

ANSWER FILED BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR& COHEN.

ANSWER FILED BY BOBBY RAE WATKINS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF RICHARDSON, FAIR& COHEN.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC., RODRIGO BOA

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC., RODRIGO BOA

ANSWER FILED BY RODRIGO BOA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

ANSWER FILED BY RODRIGO BOA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

ANSWER FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

ANSWER FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT(S) SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT(S) SENT.; Minutes; TWO ANSWERS, NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, CROSS-COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON; CROSS COMPLAINT ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS; FILED ON 01/04/19, NOT ANSWERING TO FIRST AMENDED. DEFENDANTS AREANSWERING TO COMPLAINT.; (RUNNER); NOTICES PRINTED

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR VERNON JACKSON IS VERNON JACKSON II -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR VERNON JACKSON IS VERNON JACKSON II -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY KEITH D DAVIS.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VERNON JACKSON

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF VERNON JACKSON

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BOBBY RAE WATKINS SERVED ON 12/04/18 WITH FEES OF $109.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BOBBY RAE WATKINS SERVED ON 12/04/18 WITH FEES OF $109.95.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERNON JACKSON, VERNON JACKSON II, APRIL DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR VERNON JACKSON, VERNON JACKSON II, APRIL DAVIS.; Minutes; Receipt: 190807-0480 $155.00; 190807-0480-VS Reference Number 033-0143889845

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY VERNON JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGO BOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR RODRIGO BOA.; Minutes; Receipt: 190802-0664 $150.00; 190802-0664-CK Reference Number CK-3689087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORIGINAL REQUIRES A SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY RODRIGO BOA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARANGA & MORGENSTERN.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BOBBY RAE WATKINS SERVED ON 12/04/18 WITH FEES OF $109.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON UPS GROUND FREIGHT,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $109.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • PLAINTIFF VERNON JACKSON, VERNON JACKSON II, APRIL DAVIS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VERNON JACKSON, VERNON JACKSON II, APRIL DAVIS FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 181114-0502 $435.00; 181114-0502-CK Reference Number CK-3655694

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.