This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 14:31:42 (UTC).

VERMONT STREET-V-DOE UNKNOWN OCCUPANT

Case Summary

On 01/19/2016 VERMONT STREET-V-DOE UNKNOWN OCCUPANT was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0091

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERMONT STREET LLC

Defendant

NICOLE PHILIPS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 160211-2149 $25.00; 160211-2149-MO Reference Number R106674844265

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO NICOLE PHILIPS, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO NICOLE PHILIPS, FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/04/16; JUDGMENT FOR: VERMONT STREET LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160114-2658 $255.00; 160114-2658-CS Reference Number 1018

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 160211-2149 $25.00; 160211-2149-MO Reference Number R106674844265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 01/19/16 AS TO NICOLE PHILIPS, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/04/16; JUDGMENT FOR: VERMONT STREET LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC AS TO NICOLE PHILIPS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON NICOLE PHILIPS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/19/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC FILED CHANGING NAME OF NICOLE PHILIPS TO NICOLE PHILIPS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF VERMONT STREET LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160114-2658 $255.00; 160114-2658-CS Reference Number 1018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vermont Street Acquisition LLC is a litigant