This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:04:59 (UTC).

VERDUGO -V- HARMON

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 VERDUGO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARMON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0025

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDDIE VERDUGO

Defendant

THERESA HARMON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-22-17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-22-17); Minutes; Receipt: 170322-0344 $25.00; 170322-0344-CK Reference Number 1167686

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/20/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON THERESA HARMON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/20/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON THERESA HARMON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/20/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY THERESA HARMON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY THERESA HARMON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170120-0620 $255.00; 170120-0620-CK Reference Number 1165624

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $16.33.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-22-17); Minutes; Receipt: 170322-0344 $25.00; 170322-0344-CK Reference Number 1167686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF EDDIE VERDUGO PRESENT; ATTORNEY LUKE SINKINSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT THERESA HARMON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT); WITNESS -- EDDIE VERDUGO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- THERESA HARMON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: EDDIE VERDUGO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: THERESA HARMON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 03/31/17.; ALL PERSONAL BELONGINGS LEFT BEHIND ARE DEEMED ABANDONED. NO FURTHER STAYS OR POST JUDGMENT; MOTIONS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $330.00 AND DAMAGES $1,249.53.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,079.53; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • REQUEST TO SET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): HAS ALREADY BEEN FILES WITH COURT *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY THERESA HARMON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY THERESA HARMON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170125-0384 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • ADA NOTICE MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170120-0620 $255.00; 170120-0620-CK Reference Number 1165624

    Read MoreRead Less