This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:27:26 (UTC).

VELO VS KORDYAK

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 VELO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KORDYAK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1032

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

IVSON VELO

MICHAEL KORDYAK

Defendant and Other

MICHAEL KORDYAK

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0433 $10.00; 170109-0433-MC Reference Number 025-0064395646

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0642 $50.00; 170327-0642-DB Reference Number 482784

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK INDIVIDUAL & DBA MK HAMMER SPEED FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK INDIVIDUAL & DBA MK HAMMER SPEED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:53; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF IVSON VELO PRESENT; DEFENDANT MICHAEL KORDYAK PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- IVSON VELO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- MICHAEL KORDYAK IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF IVSON VELO ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR MICHAEL KORDYAK.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 08/03/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,300.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $154.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,454.50; JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 03/27/2017 OF MICHAEL KORDYAK ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR MICHAEL KORDYAK.; AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF 000200.; BOAT IS TO BE RETURNED TO THE PLAINTIFF FOR THE PARTIES TO TEST DRIVE THE BOAT; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CASE SET FOR 08/03/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; 02:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO IVSON VELO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO IVSON VELO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA & DECLARATION BY SUB SERVICE ON 03/16/17 AS TO MARIBEL GUZMAN - HR COORDINATOR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA & DECLARATION BY SUB SERVICE ON 03/16/17 AS TO MARIBEL GUZMAN - HR COORDINATOR, FILED.

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0165 $75.00; 161215-0165-EZ Reference Number PU58642WW775103M

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CASE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: IVSON VELO, MICHAEL KORDYAK, MICHAEL KORDYAK; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF IVSON VELO.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 03/27/2017 OF MICHAEL KORDYAK.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCES.; ACTION - COMPLETE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:53; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF IVSON VELO PRESENT; DEFENDANT MICHAEL KORDYAK PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- IVSON VELO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- MICHAEL KORDYAK IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF IVSON VELO ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR MICHAEL KORDYAK.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 08/03/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,300.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $154.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,454.50; JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 03/27/2017 OF MICHAEL KORDYAK ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR MICHAEL KORDYAK.; AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF 000200.; BOAT IS TO BE RETURNED TO THE PLAINTIFF FOR THE PARTIES TO TEST DRIVE THE BOAT; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CASE SET FOR 08/03/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; 02:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF IVSON VELO PRESENT; DEFENDANT MICHAEL KORDYAK PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NOT RECORDED; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PARTIES.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/06/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM FILED AS TO IVSON VELO. PARTY SERVED ON 03/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 031-0010536099

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY MICHAEL KORDYAK (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0642 $50.00; 170327-0642-DB Reference Number 482784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA & DECLARATION BY SUB SERVICE ON 03/16/17 AS TO MARIBEL GUZMAN - HR COORDINATOR, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS DENIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2017
  • FAX>SC105>GIL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0433 $10.00; 170109-0433-MC Reference Number 025-0064395646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK INDIVIDUAL & DBA MK HAMMER SPEED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MICHAEL KORDYAK. PARTY SERVED ON 12/29/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $79.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161215-0165 $75.00; 161215-0165-EZ Reference Number PU58642WW775103M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 0PU58642WW775103M

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.