This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 14:46:14 (UTC).

VELEZ -V- ROCHA

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 VELEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROCHA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Widman, Joseph B and Sinfield, Lily L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1742

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Widman, Joseph B

Sinfield, Lily L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUBEN VELEZ

VELEZ, RUBEN

Defendants

LAURENCE ROCHA

ROCHA, LAURENCE

DOOR AND WINDOW DREAMS

Not Yet Classified

CONV

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) 200312-0569-EZ SMA-

03/12/2020: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) 200312-0569-EZ SMA-

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

06/02/2020: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

06/02/2020: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

Clerk's Notice of Hearing - Civil

06/02/2020: Clerk's Notice of Hearing - Civil

Clerk's Notice of Hearing - Civil

06/02/2020: Clerk's Notice of Hearing - Civil

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

07/30/2020: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

07/30/2020: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

10/22/2020: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Widman, Joseph B; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Lack of Prosecution - Before Hearing (SC); Party; Comment; Comment: (Plaintiff's claim dismissed without prejudice on 10/22/2020.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPursuant to Gov Code 68152- 68153 case to be destroyed on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCase ordered dismissed in its Entirety; Comment: without prejudice, no appearances/no service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Original Type: Small Claims Hearing Reset; Judicial Officer: Widman, Joseph B; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Sinfield, Lily L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMatter continued per emergency order pursuant to GC 68115.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Sinfield, Lily L; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued Court's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Sinfield, Lily L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200312-0569; ConversionPayment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketTurbo Court Transaction ID#:; Comment: E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 4S621305MA386963C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketComment:; Comment: CERT MAIL AS TO LAURENCE ROCHA; TRACKING NUMBER: 7019 2280 0001 8676 1318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT. 200312-0573-EZ SMM/ 15.00 PAYMT 200312-0573-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER 4S621305MA386963

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketUpdate Default Department to:; Comment: UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff <$1500 Filed; Comment: CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) 200312-0569-EZ SMA/ 30.00 PAYMT 200312-0569-EZ REFERENCE NUMBER 4S621305MA386963

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where Doors & Windows is a litigant